No. 16-1546
Title:Adrian R. Scott, Petitioner
v.
Maryland State Department of Labor, Licensing and Regulation, et al.
Docketed:June 23, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1617)
   Decision Date:December 20, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:March 30, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 23 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2017)
Jul 11 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 22, 2017.
Sep 22 2017Brief of respondents Maryland State Department of Labor, Licensing and Regulation, et al. in opposition filed.
Oct 10 2017Reply of petitioner Adrian R.Scott filed.
Oct 11 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 30 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eamon Paul Joyce
    Counsel of Record
787 7th Avenue
New York, NY 10019

ejoyce@sidley.com
(212)-839-5300
Party name: Adrian R.Scott
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew John Fader
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Office of the Attorney General
200 St. Paul Place, 20th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21202-2021

mfader@oag.state.md.us
(410) 576-7906
Party name: Maryland State Department of Labor, Licensing and Regulation, et al.