No. 16-1541
Title:Margaret Richek Goldberg, Petitioner
v.
Bank of America, N.A., et al.
Docketed:June 23, 2017
Linked with 16A1099
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(11-2989)
   Decision Date:January 23, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 21, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 09 2017Application (16A1099) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 22, 2017 to June 21, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
May 11 2017Application (16A1099) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 21, 2017.
Jun 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2017)
Jul 14 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 23, 2017.
Aug 23 2017Brief of respondents Bank of America, N.A., et al. in opposition filed.
Sep 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 06 2017Reply of petitioner Margaret R.Goldberg filed. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Arthur Doyle
    Counsel of Record
55 West Monroe Street
Suite 3300
Chicago, IL 60603

(312)-346-2222
Party name: Margaret R.Goldberg
Attorneys for Respondents
Kannon Kumar Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202)-434-5000
Party name: Bank of America, et al.