No. 16-1540
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Petitioners
v.
Hawaii, et al.
Docketed:June 26, 2017
Linked with 16A1191, 17A275
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15589)
   Decision Date:June 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2017Application (16A1191) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jun 02 2017Response to application due on or before 3 p.m., Monday, June 12, 2017.
Jun 02 2017Application (16A1191) referred to the Court.
Jun 09 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by Association of American Medical Colleges and Others, in support of respondents.
Jun 09 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Center for Law and Justice.
Jun 12 2017Response to application from respondents Hawaii, et al. filed.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by Constitutional Law Scholars in support of respondents.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amicus brief filed by Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Inc. in support of petitioners.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by Former National Security Officials in support of respondents.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1191) for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Professional Society on Abuse of Children in support of respondents.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by The States of Virginia, et al. in opposition to the stay applications.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligious Organizations.
Jun 13 2017Letter of applicants Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. received. (Distributed)
Jun 13 2017Letter of respondents Hawaii, et al. received. (Distributed)
Jun 13 2017In consideration of the June 13, 2017 letters received from applicants and respondents, applicants are directed to file a supplemental brief on or before 3 p.m., Thursday, June 15, 2017. Respondents are directed to file a response on or before 12 p.m., Tuesday, June 20, 2017. Applicants are directed to file a reply on or before 12 p.m., Wednesday, June 21, 2017.
Jun 15 2017Supplemental brief of applicants Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Jun 20 2017Response to supplemental brief of respondents Hawaii, et al. filed.
Jun 21 2017Reply of applicants Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Jun 26 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed.
Jun 26 2017Application (16A1191) and application (16A1190) are GRANTED IN PART. In addition, application (16A1191) is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari. The petitions for writs of certiorari in 16-1436 and 16-1540 are GRANTED and the cases are consolidated for argument. In addition to the issues identified in the petitions, the parties are directed to address the following question: "Whether the challenges to Sec. 2(c) became moot on June 14, 2017." Justice Thomas, with whom Justice Alito and Justice Gorsuch join, concurring in part and dissenting in part. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion). VIDED.
Jun 26 2017The due dates for the briefs on the merits in 16-1436 and 16-1540 are as provided for by Rule 25 of the Rules of this Court. VIDED.
Jul 15 2017Motion for clarification filed by petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Jul 15 2017Response to motion for clarification due on or before 12 p.m., Tuesday, July 18, 2017.
Jul 17 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or neither party from counsel for the petitioners. VIDED
Jul 18 2017Response to motion for clarification from respondents Hawaii, et al. filed.
Jul 18 2017Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief of Former National Security Officials in opposition to motion for clarification filed. (Distributed)
Jul 18 2017Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief of Law Professors in opposition to motion for clarification filed. (Distributed)
Jul 18 2017Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief of Members of Congress in opposition to motion for clarification filed. (Distributed)
Jul 18 2017Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief of The International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. in opposition to motion for clarification filed. (Distributed)
Jul 18 2017Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief of States of New York, et al. in opposition to motion for clarification filed. (Distributed)
Jul 18 2017Reply of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. on motion for clarification filed.
Jul 19 2017The Government’s motion seeking clarification of our order of June 26, 2017, is denied. The District Court order modifying the preliminary injunction with respect to refugees covered by a formal assurance is stayed pending resolution of the Government’s appeal to the Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, and Justice Gorsuch would have stayed the District Court order in its entirety.
Jul 19 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 10, 2017. VIDED.
Jul 20 2017Letter of respondents Hawaii, et al. received. (Distributed)
Jul 26 2017Application (17A132) of Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. to file a consolidated petitioners' brief on the merits and a consolidated reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limits, submitted to The Chief Justice. VIDED.
Jul 31 2017Application (17A132) granted by The Chief Justice to file a consolidated petitioners' brief on the merits and a consolidated reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limits. VIDED.
Aug 01 2017Record requested from U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Aug 03 2017Brief amici curiae of Public Policy Legal Institute and Center for Competitive Politics in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Aug 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Criminal Justice Legal Foundation in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Aug 08 2017Motion to add John Doe as a party filed by respondents Hawaii, et al.
Aug 10 2017Joint appendix filed (3 volumes). VIDED.
Aug 10 2017Brief of petitioners Trump, President of U.S., et al. filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017CIRCULATED.
Aug 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of Professor Victor Williams filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Motion for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument filed by respondents. VIDED.
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Response to motion to add John Doe as a party filed by petitioners Trump, President of U.S., et al.
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of Hardwired Global, et al. in support of neither party filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Rights Union filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Zionist Organization of America filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of National Security Experts Andrew C. McCarthy, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Mormon History & Law in support of neither party filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Foundation for Moral Law. VIDED.
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of American Legislators in Support of Judicial Restraint filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 22 2017Reply in support of motion to add John Doe as a party filed by respondents Hawaii, et al.
Aug 22 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 24 2017Further consideration of the motion of respondents Hawaii, et al. to add John Doe as a party to 16-1540 is deferred to the hearing of the case on the merits. VIDED.
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Interfaith Coalition filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of T.A., a United States Citizen of Yemeni Descent filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of National CIS Council 119 filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Chicago, Los Angeles, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 11 2017Application (17A275) for a stay of mandate.
Sep 11 2017Brief of respondents Hawaii, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 11 2017IT IS ORDERED that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, case No. 17-16426, is hereby stayed with respect to refugees covered by a formal assurance, pending receipt of a response, due on or before Tuesday, September 12, 2017, by 12 p.m., and further order of the undersigned or of the Court.
Sep 12 2017Response to application from respondents Hawaii, et al. filed.
Sep 12 2017Brief amici curiae of International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 12 2017Reply of applicants Trump, President of U.S., et al. filed.
Sep 12 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by International Refugee Assistance Project and HIAS, Inc.
Sep 12 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by U.S. Committee for Refugees and Immigrants.
Sep 12 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Lutheran Immigration and Refugee Service, et al.
Sep 12 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops
Sep 12 2017Application (17A275) referred to the Court.
Sep 12 2017The application for stay of mandate presented to Justice Kennedy and by him referred to the Court is granted, and the issuance of the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit in case No. 17-16426 is stayed with respect to refugees covered by a formal assurance, pending further order of this Court.
Sep 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of Freedom from Religion Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 13 2017Brief amici curiae of Civil Rights Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of Japanese American Citizens Leaque filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Anti-Defamation League, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of Khizr Khan filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 14 2017Brief amici curiae of 37 Appellate Lawyers filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Jewish Committee filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of KARAMAH filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 15 2017Brief amici curiae of Episcopal Bishops filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of International Labor Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Immigration Family and Constitutional Law Professors filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Professors of Federal Courts Jurisprudence, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of The Foundation for the Children of Iran, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars Corey Brettschneider, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Pars Equality Center, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Tahirih Justice Center, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of Port of Seattle filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Colleges and Universities filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars Gabriel "Jack" chin, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Members of the Clergy, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of 161 Technology Companies filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Karen Korematsu, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of International Lawyers for International Law filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Association of Art Museum Directors, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of PEN American Center, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Social Science Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of American Council on Education, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Muslim Justice League, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Human Rights First, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Immigration Equality, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Former National Security Officials filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of The Association of American Medical Colleges, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Federal Jurisdiction filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Certain Immigrant Rights Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Executive Branch Officials filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Refugee Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligious Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of Syrian Asylee Ahmad M. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Education Association filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Immigration Law Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of The National Asian Pacific American Bar Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of New York University filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Advocates for Human Rights, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Hussam Ayloush, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Howard University Scool of Law Civil Rights Clinic, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of Janet A. Napolitano and other Former Federal Immigration Officials filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 18 2017Brief amici curiae of States of New York, et al., filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Sep 24 2017Letter of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. received. (Distributed). VIDED
Sep 25 2017The parties are directed to file letter briefs addressing whether, or to what extent, the Proclamation issued on September 24, 2017, may render cases No. 16-1436 and 16-1540 moot. The parties should also address whether, or to what extent, the scheduled expiration of Sections 6(a) and 6(b) of Executive Order No. 13780 may render those aspects of case No. 16-1540 moot. The briefs, limited to 10 pages, are to be filed simultaneously with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before noon, Thursday, October 5, 2017. The cases are removed from the oral argument calendar, pending further order of the Court. VIDED
Oct 04 2017Reply of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of United States, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Oct 05 2017Supplemental brief of petitioners Trump, President of U.S., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Oct 05 2017Supplemental brief of respondents Hawaii, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 05 2017Letter of respondents Hawaii, et al. filed. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Trump, President of U.S., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Omar Cassim Jadwat
    Counsel of Record
125 Broad Street
18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

ojadwat@aclu.org
(212) 549-2500
Party name: Int'l Refugee Assistance Project, et al.
Neal K. Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5600
Party name: Hawaii, et al.
Other
Bruce D. Abramson
    Counsel of Record
University of Baltimore School of Law
1420 North Charles Street
Baltimore, MD 22101

gdolin@ubalt.edu
410-837-4610
Party name: Hardwired Global, et al.
Amir Hatem Mahdy Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange
MacArthur Justice Center
718 7th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
(202) 869-3434
Party name: The Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center
Mark A. Aronchick
    Counsel of Record
Hangley, Aronchick, Segal, Pudlin & Schiller
One Logan Square, 27th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

maronchick@hangley.com
215-568-6200
Party name: Immigration, Family, and Constitutional Law Professors
Lynne Bernabei
    Counsel of Record
Bernabei & Kabat, PLLC
1400 - 16th Street, N.W., Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036-2223

Bernabei@Bernabeipllc.com
202.745.1942
Party name: Civil Rights Organizations
Richard Douglas Bernstein
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
1875 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

rbernstein@willkie.com
202-303-1000
Party name: T.A., a United States Citizen of Yemeni descent
Charles A. Bird
    Counsel of Record
4182 Ingalls Street
San Diego, CA 92103

birdamicus17@gmail.com
619-699-2406
Party name: 37 Appellate Lawyers
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

lisa.blatt@apks.com
(202)-942-5000
Party name: Pars Equality Center, et al.
David Christopher Boyle
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
Richard P. Bress
    Counsel of Record
Latkins & Watkins, LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

richard.bress@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: Refugee Organizations
Daniel L. Brown
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard, Mullin, LLP
30 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY 10112

dlbrown@sheppardmullin.com
212-634-3095
Party name: KARAMAH
George Eric Brunstad
    Counsel of Record
Dechert, LLP
90 State House Square
Hartford, CT 06013

eric.brunstad@dechert.com
(860)-524-3999
Party name: Human Rights First, et al.
Walter Dellinger
    Counsel of Record
Duke School of Law
210 Science Drive
Durham, NC 27707-0000

wdellinger@omm.com
202-383-5319
Party name: Japanese American Citizens Leaque
Muhammad Usman Faridi
    Counsel of Record
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

mfaridi@pbwt.com
212-336-2000
Party name: National CIS Council 119
Aaron Xavier Fellmeth
    Counsel of Record
Sandra Day O'Connor College of Law, Mail Code 9520
Arizona State Univ., 111 E. Taylor St.
Phoenix, AZ 85004-4467

aaron.fellmeth@asu.edu
(480)-727-8575
Party name: International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations
Chad Ian Golder
    Counsel of Record
Munger Tolles & OLson, LLP
1155 F Street, NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

chadgolder@mto.com
202-220-1100
Party name: American Council on Education, et al.
Eric James Gorman
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
155 North Wacker Drive
Suite 2800
Chicago, IL 60606

eric.gorman@skadden.com
312 407 0700
Party name: Immigration Equality, et al.
John B. Harris
    Counsel of Record
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, P.C.
488 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10022

jharris@fkks.com
212-705-4823
Party name: Anti-Defamation League, et al.
Lindsay C. Harrison
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

lharrison@jenner.com
(202)-639-6000
Party name: Colleges and Universities
Marc Andrew Hearron
    Counsel of Record
Morrison Foester, LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 6000
Washington, DC 20006

mhearron@mofo.com
202-778-1663
Party name: Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligious Organizations
Aziz Huq
    Counsel of Record
University of Chicago
1111 E. 60th Street
Chicago, IL 60622

huq@uchicago.edu
773-702-9566
Party name: Social Science Scholars
Darin Edward-Wesley Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic
2900 Van Ness St. NW
Washington, DC 20008

darin.johnson@law.howard.edu
202 807 8067
Party name: Howard University Scool of Law Civil Rights Clinic, et al.
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
1250 Connecticut Avenue
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20036

lj@larryjoseph.com
202-355-9452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Roberta A Kaplan
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan & Company, LLP
350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 7110
New York, NY 10118

rkaplan@kaplanandcompany.com
(212)-763-0883
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars Corey Brettschneider, et al.
Peter Karanjia
    Counsel of Record
Davis, Wright, Tremaine, LLP
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

peterkaranjia@dwt.com
(202)-973-4256
Party name: Members of Congress
Richard Brian Katskee
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L Street, NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

katskee@au.org
(202)-466-3234
Party name: Members of the Clergy, et al.
John W Keker
    Counsel of Record
Keker, Van Nest & Peters, LLP
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

jkeker@keker.com
415-391- 5400
Party name: Khizr Khan
Scott Keller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scottkeller@texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas, et al.
Harold Hongju Koh
    Counsel of Record
Rule of Law Clinic, Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06520-8215

harold.koh@ylsclinics.org
203-432-4932
Party name: Former National Security Officials
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
750 Seventh Avenue, 26th Floor
New York, NY 10019

vlevy@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: Syrian Asylee Ahmed M.
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Suite 3000
Los Angeles, CA 90071

jlipshutz@gibsondunn.com
213-229-7000
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.
David Yury Livshiz
    Counsel of Record
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer, US, LLP
601 Lexington Avenue, 31stFloor
New York, NY 10022

david.livshiz@freshfields.com
212-277-4000
Party name: Cato Institute
Adam S. Lurie
    Counsel of Record
Linklaters, LLP
601 13th St., Suite 400 South
Washington, DC 20005

adam.lurie@linklaters.com
(202)-654-9200
Party name: American Jewish Committee
Rebecca Susan Markert
    Counsel of Record
Freedom from Religion Foundation
P.O. Box 750
Madison, WI 53701

rmarkert@ffrf.org
608-256-8900
Party name: Freedom from Religion Foundation
Kevin Paul Martin
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
100 Northern Avenue
Boston, MA 02210

kmartin@goodwinlaw.com
(617) 570-1000
Party name: Foundation for the Children of Ian
Alice Margaret O'Brien
    Counsel of Record
National Eduction Association
1201 16th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

aobrien@nea.org
202 822 7035
Party name: National Education Association
Mary Kelly Persyn
    Counsel of Record
Persyn Law & Policy
912 Cole Street, PMB 124
San Francisco, CA 94117

marykelly@persynlaw.com
628 400-1254
Party name: American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: 161 Technology Companies
Michael William Price
    Counsel of Record
Brennan Center for Justice at NY University School of Law
120 Broadway, Suite 1750
New York, NY 10271

michael.price@nyu.edu
(646) 292-8335
Party name: Hussam Ayloush, et al.
Fred Anthony Rowley
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP
350 South Grand Avenue
Fiftieth Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

fred.rowley@mto.com
213-683-9100
Party name: Professors of Federal Courts, et al.
Kent Stephen Scheidegger
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Fdn.
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

briefs@cjlf.org
916-446-0345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation in support of neither party
Michael Ramsey Scott
    Counsel of Record
Hillis Clark Martin & Peterson, P.S.
999 Third Avenue, Suite 4600
Seattle, WA 98104

michael.scott@hcmp.com
206-623-1745
Party name: Episcopal Bishops
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202) 546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Benjamin Gross Shatz
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
11355 West Olympic Boulevard
Los Angles, CA 90064

bshatz@manatt.com
(310)-312-4000
Party name: Muslim Justice League, et al.
Matthew D. Slater
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

mslater@cgsh.com
202-974-1500
Party name: Lutheran Immigration and Refugee Service and Foster Parents
Deborah Lynn Smith
    Counsel of Record
Service Employees International Union
1800 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

debbie.smith@seiu.org
202-730-7168
Party name: International Labor Organizations
Ilya Somin
    Counsel of Record
Professor of Law, George Mason University
3301 Fairfax Dr.
Arlington, VA 22201

isomin@gmu.edu
(703)-993-8069
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars Gabriel "Jack" chin, et al.
Ellyde Roko Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

ellydethompson@quinnemanuel.com
212-849-7000
Party name: Port of Seattle
Scott Lewis Winkelman
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring, LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

swinkelman@crowell.com
202-624-2500
Party name: Tahirih Justice Center, et al.
Christopher J. Wright
    Counsel of Record
Harris, Wiltshire & Grannis, LLP
1919 M Street, NW, Fl. 8
Washignton, DC 20036

cwright@hwglaw.com
202-333-1300
Party name: American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
Barnaby W. Zall
    Counsel of Record
685 Spring St. #314
Friday Harbor, WA 98250

bzall@bzall.com
360-378-6600
Party name: Public Policy Legal Institute and Center for Competitive Politics in support of neither party
Mark A. AronchickOne Logan Square, 27th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

maronchick@hangley.com
(215) 568-6200
Party name: Law Professors
Brianne Jenna GorodConstitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
(202) 296-6889
Party name: Members of Congress
Marc A. HearronMorrison & Forester LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Suite 6000
Washington, DC 20006

MHearron@mofo.com
(202)-778-1663
Party name: Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligious Organizations
Mariko HiroseInternational Refugee Assistance Project
40 Rector Street, 9th Floor
New York, NY 10006

mhirose@refugeerights.org
(646) 459-3044
Party name: The International Refugee Assistance Project, et al.
Roberta A. KaplanPaul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019-6064

rkaplan@paulweiss.com
(212) 373-3000
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars
Harold Hongju KohRule of Law Clinic
Yale Law School
127 Wall Street, P.O. Box 208215
New Haven, CT 06520-8215

harold.koh@yale.edu
(203) 432-4932
Party name: Former National Security Officials
Mary Kelly PersynPersyn Law & Policy
912 Cole Street PMB 124
San Francisco, CA 94117

marykelly@persynlaw.com
628 400-1254
Party name: American Professional Society on Abuse of Children
Stuart A. RaphaelSolicitor General of Virginia
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

sraphael@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7240
Party name: The States of Virginia, et al.
Mark L. RienziThe Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Avenue, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

mrienzi@becketfund.org
(202) 955-0095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Joshua David RogaczewskiMcDermott Will & Emery, LLP
The McDermott Building, 500 North Capitol Street, Northwest
Washington, DC 20001

jrogaczewski@mwe.com
202-756-8195
Party name: Association of American Medical Colleges and Others, in support of respondents
Barbara D. UnderwoodSolicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
120 Broadway, 25th Floor
New York, NY 10271-0332

barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
(212) 416-8020
Party name: States of New York, et al.