No. 16-1536
Title:Patricia Holtz, et al., Petitioners
v.
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al.
Docketed:June 23, 2017
Linked with 16A979
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-2609)
   Decision Date:January 23, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 14 2017Application (16A979) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 23, 2017 to May 24, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Apr 16 2017Application (16A979) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 24, 2017.
May 10 2017Application (16A979) to further extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 24, 2017 to June 22, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
May 11 2017Application (16A979) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 22, 2017.
Jun 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2017)
Jul 19 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 23, 2017.
Aug 23 2017Brief of respondents JPMorgan Chase Bank, et al. in opposition filed.
Sep 05 2017Reply of petitioners Patricia Holtz, et al. filed.
Sep 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tg@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Patricia Holtz, et al.
Thomas C. GoldsteinGoldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tg@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Patricia Holtz, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al.
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: JPMorgan Chase Bank, et al.