No. 16-1524
Title:M-I, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Sarmad Syed
Docketed:June 21, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-17186)
   Decision Date:January 20, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 20, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 21, 2017)
Jul 21 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Consumer Data Industry Association.
Jul 21 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America.
Aug 01 2017Waiver of right of respondent Sarmad Syed to respond filed.
Aug 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 10 2017Response Requested. (Due September 11, 2017)
Aug 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 11, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allyson N. Ho
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1717 Main Street, Suite 3200
Dallas, TX 75201-7347

allyson.ho@morganlewis.com
(214) 466-4000
Party name: M-I, LLC
Other
Ashley C. Parrish
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pensylvania Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006-2706

aparrish@kslaw.com
(202) 626-2627
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
David Meir Zionts
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One City Center
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

dzionts@cov.com
202-662-5987
Party name: Consumer Data Industry Association