No. 16-1519
Title:Sergio Fernando Lagos, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 21, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-20146)
   Decision Date:March 17, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 15 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 21, 2017)
Jul 12 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 21, 2017.
Aug 14 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 20, 2017.
Sep 18 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 26, 2017.
Oct 24 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 30, 2017.
Nov 30 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 08 2017Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner Sergio F.Lagos.
Main Document
Dec 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Dec 13 2017Reply of petitioner Sergio F.Lagos filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 12 2018Petition GRANTED.
Feb 09 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Sergio F.Lagos.
Blanket Consent
Feb 23 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 18, 2018.
Feb 26 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 26 2018Brief of petitioner Sergio F.Lagos filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Professor Shon Hopwood filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018CIRCULATED
Mar 28 2018Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Mar 30 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Apr 11 2018Reply of petitioner Sergio F.Lagos filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2018Argued. For petitioner: Daniel L. Geyser, Dallas, Tex. For respondent: Michael R. Huston, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Stris & Maher LLP
725 South Figueroa Street, Suite 1830
Los Angeles, CA 90017

daniel.geyser@strismaher.com
213-995-6811
Party name: Sergio F. Lagos
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
3102068506
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Gregory M. Lipper
    Counsel of Record
Clinton Brook & Peed
1455 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20004

glipper@clintonbrook.com
(202) 996-0919
Party name: Professor Shon Hopwood