No. 16-1513 | |
Title: | PLIVA INC., Petitioner v. Superior Court of California, City and County of San Francisco, et al. |
Docketed: | June 20, 2017 |
Linked with 16A952 | |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District |
Case Numbers: | (A149468) |
Decision Date: | November 9, 2016 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | January 18, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 04 2017 | Application (16A952) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 18, 2017 to June 16, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Apr 07 2017 | Application (16A952) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until June 16, 2017. |
Jun 16 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 20, 2017) |
Jul 17 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 18, 2017. |
Aug 16 2017 | Brief of respondent Superior Court of CA, et al. in opposition filed. |
Aug 30 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. |
Sep 01 2017 | Reply of petitioner PLIVA INC. filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jeffrey F. Peck Counsel of Record | Ulmer & Berne LLP 600 Vine Street, Suite 2800 Cincinnati, OH 45202-2409 jpeck@ulmer.com | (513) 698-5010 |
Party name: PLIVA INC. | ||
Jeffrey F. Peck Counsel of Record | Ulmer & Berne, LLP 600 Vine Street, Suite 2800 Cincinnati, OH 45202 jpeck@ulmer.com | (513)-698-5000 |
Party name: PLIVA INC. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Mark Gavin Crawford Counsel of Record | One Sansome Street, Suite 2830 San Francisco, CA 94104 mcrawford@skikoscrawford.com | 415-546-7300 |
Party name: Superior Court of CA, et al. |