No. 16-1498
Title:Washington State Department of Licensing, Petitioner
v.
Cougar Den, Inc.
Docketed:June 16, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(92289-6)
   Decision Date:March 16, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 17, 2017)
Jul 13 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 16, 2017.
Jul 17 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Idaho, et al. filed.
Jul 17 2017Brief amici curiae of Washington Oil Marketers Association, et al. filed.
Aug 16 2017Brief of respondent Cougar Den, Inc. in opposition filed.
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation filed.
Aug 29 2017Reply of petitioner Washington State Department of Licensing filed. (Distributed)
Aug 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
May 30 2018Supplemental brief of respondent Cougar Den, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition GRANTED.
Aug 09 2018Brief of petitioner Washington State Department of Licensing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2018Joint appendix filed.
Main Document
Aug 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Washington Oil Marketers Association and the Washington Association of Neighborhood Stores filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2018Amicus brief of Multistate Tax Commission and Federation of Tax Administrators submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2018Amicus brief of The States of Idaho et al submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2018Amicus brief of Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 17 2018Motion of Cougar Den, Inc. for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-2536
Party name: Washington State Department of Licensing
Attorneys for Respondent
Mathew Lane Harrington
    Counsel of Record
Stokes Lawrence, P.S.
1420 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3000
Seattle, WA 98101

mlh@stokeslaw.com
2066266000
Party name: Cougar Den, Inc.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Mark Ely Greenwold
    Counsel of Record
Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids
1400 I Street N.W., Suite 1200
Washington, DC 20007

mgreenwold@gmail.com
2024819560
Party name: Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, et al.
Helen Hecht
    Counsel of Record
Multistate Tax Commission
444 N. Capitol St., NW
Ste 425
Washington, DC 20001

hhecht@mtc.gov
2026601906
Party name: Multistate Tax Commission and Federation of Tax Administrators
Steven W. Strack
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 83720
Boise, ID 83720-0010

steve.strack@ag.idaho.gov
208-334-4143
Party name: The States of Idaho et al
Philip Albert Talmadge
    Counsel of Record
2775 Harbor Avenue SW
Third Floor, Suite C
Seattle, WA 98126

phil@tal-fitzlaw.com
2065746661
Party name: The Washington Oil Marketers Association and the Washington Association of Neighborhood Stores
Clay R. SmithDeputy Attorney General
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 83720-0010
Boise, ID 83720-0010

clay.smith@ag.idaho.gov
(208) 334-2400
Party name: The States of Idaho, et al.
Philip Albert TalmadgeTalmadge Firzpatrick Tribe
2775 Harbor Avenue, SW
Third Floor, Suite C
Seattle, WA 98126

phil@tal-fitzlaw.com
(206) 574-6661
Party name: Washington Oil Marketers Association, et al.