No. 16-1495
Title:City of Hays, Kansas, Petitioner
v.
Matthew Jack Dwight Vogt
Docketed:June 15, 2017
Linked with 16A996
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3266)
   Decision Date:January 4, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 30, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 10 2017Application (16A996) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 30, 2017 to June 29, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Apr 21 2017Application (16A996) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until June 29, 2017.
Jun 13 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 17, 2017)
Jun 29 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 16, 2017.
Aug 16 2017Brief of respondent Matthew Jack D. Vogt in opposition filed.
Aug 23 2017Reply of petitioner City of Hays, Kansas filed.
Aug 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 28 2017Petition GRANTED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Oct 02 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner.
Oct 31 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, City of Hays, Kansas
Nov 02 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Matthew Jack D. Vogt.
Nov 06 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Nov 13 2017Brief of petitioner City of Hays, Kansas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amici curiae of The State of Kansas and 12 Other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of State and Local Government Employers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 11 2017Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 13 2017Brief of respondent Matthew Jack D. Vogt filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, February 20, 2018
Dec 20 2017Brief amici curiae of American Federation of Government Employees and American Federation of Teachers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Procedure Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Fraternal Order of Police filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2017Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and American Civil Liberties Union filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2018CIRCULATED
Jan 08 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Jan 08 2018Reply of petitioner City of Hays, Kansas filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit.
Jan 12 2018The entire record from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Feb 01 2018The record received from the U.S.D.C. District of Kansas is electronic.
Feb 20 2018Argued. For petitioner: Toby J. Heytens, Charlottesville, Va.; and Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Kelsi B. Corkran, Washington, D. C.
May 29 2018Writ of certiorari DISMISSED as improvidently granted. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this case. Opinion per curiam.
Jul 02 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Toby J. HeytensSupreme Court Litigation Clinic, 580 Massie Rd.
Charlottesville, VA 22903

heytens@virginia.edu
434-924-3229
Party name: City of Hays, Kansas
Attorneys for Respondent
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
(212)-506-5000
Party name: Matthew Jack D. Vogt
Other
Natalie Chalmers
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Kansas Attorney General
120 SW 10th Avenue
2nd Floor
Topeka, KS 66612

natalie.chalmers@ag.ks.gov
(785) 296-2215
Party name: The State of Kansas and 12 Other States
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Criminal Procedure Scholars
Andres Myles Grajales
    Counsel of Record
American Federation of Government Employees, Office of the General Counsel
80 F Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

grajaa@afge.org
2026396426
Party name: American Federation of Government Employees and American Federation of Teachers
Larry H. James
    Counsel of Record
Crabbe Brown & James, LLP
500 South Front Street
Suite 1200
Columbus, OH 43215

ljames@cbjlawyers.com
614-228-5511
Party name: National Fraternal Order of Police
Jeffrey A. Mandell
    Counsel of Record
Stafford Rosenbaum, LLP
222 West Washington Avenue
Suite 900
Madison, WI 53703

jmandell@staffordlaw.com
608-210-6303
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Stuart Alan Raphael
    Counsel of Record
Hunton & Williams LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

sraphael@hunton.com
202-419-2021
Party name: State and Local Government Employers
Kymberlee Claire Stapleton
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

kym.stapleton@cjlf.org
916-446-0345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
Kent Stephen ScheideggerCriminal Justice Legal Fdtn.
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

Kent.Scheidegger@cjlf.org
9164460345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation