No. 16-1489
Title:Arizona, Petitioner
v.
Joe Paul Martinez
Docketed:June 13, 2017
Linked with 16A959
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arizona
   Case Numbers:(CR-16-0227-PR)
   Decision Date:February 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 05 2017Application (16A959) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 10, 2017 to June 9, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Apr 13 2017Application (16A959) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until June 9, 2017.
Jun 09 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2017)
Jun 27 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 14, 2017.
Jul 13 2017Brief amici curiae of Arizona Voice for Crime Victims, Inc., et al. filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief of respondent Joe P. Martinez in opposition filed.
Aug 28 2017Reply of petitioner Arizona filed.
Aug 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dominic E. Draye
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of Arizona Attorney General
1275 W. Washington Street
Phoenix, AZ 85007

solicitorgeneral@azag.gov
(602) 542-3333
Party name: Arizona
Dominic Emil Draye
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1275 W. Washington Street
Phoenix, AZ 85007

solicitorgeneral@azag.gov
602-542-3333
Party name: Arizona
Attorneys for Respondent
Jean-Jacques Cabou
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
2901 N. Central Ave.
Suite 2000
Phoenix, AZ 85012-2788

JCabou@perkinscoie.com
(602) 351-8000
Party name: Joe Paul Martinez
Jean-Jacques Cabou
    Counsel of Record
2901 N. Central Ave.
Suite 2000
Phoenix, AZ 85012

jcabou@perkinscoie.com
(602)-351-8000
Party name: Joe P. Martinez
Other
Kyle Douglas HawkinsGibson, Dunn, & Crutcher, LLP
2100 McKinney Ave., Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75201

khawkins@gibsondunn.com
(214) 698-3100
Party name: Arizona Voice for Crime Victims, Inc., et al.