No. 16-1479
Title:Final Exit Network, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Minnesota
Docketed:June 13, 2017
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Minnesota
   Case Numbers:(A15-1826)
   Decision Date:December 19, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 14, 2017
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 07 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2017)
Jul 13 2017Brief of respondent Minnesota in opposition filed.
Aug 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert RivasSachs Sax Caplan, P. L.
660 East Jefferson Street
Suite 102
Tallahassee, FL 32301

rrivas@ssclawfirm.com
(850) 412-0306
Party name: Final Exit Network, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Phillip D. Prokopowicz
    Counsel of Record
Chief Deputy AttorneyCounty
Dakota County Attorney's Office
1560 Highway 55
Hastings, MN 55033

phil.prokopowicz.dakota.mn.us
(651) 438-4438
Party name: Minnesota