No. 16-1468
Title:Scott Kernan, Secretary, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Petitioner
v.
Michael Daniel Cuero
Docketed:June 8, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(12-55911)
   Decision Date:June 30, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:March 8, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 10, 2017)
Jul 06 2017Brief of respondent Michael Daniel Cuero in opposition filed.
Jul 06 2017Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Michael Daniel Cuero.
Jul 24 2017Reply of petitioner Scott Kernan, Secretary, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation filed.
Jul 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Sep 05 2017Record Requested.
Sep 05 2017Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit. The record is electronic.
Oct 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anthony Da Silva
    Counsel of Record
Deputy Attorney General
State of California Department of Justice
600 West Broadway, Suite 1800
San Diego, CA 92101

Anthony.DaSilva@doj.ca.gov
(619) 738-9143
Party name: Scott Kernan, Secretary, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Attorneys for Respondent
Devin J. Burstein
    Counsel of Record
Warren & Burstein
501 W. Broadway, Suite 240
San Diego, CA 92101

db@wabulaw.com
(619) 234-4433
Party name: Michael Daniel Cuero