No. 16-1461 | |
Title: | Ramchandra Adhikari, et al., Petitioners v. Kellogg Brown & Root, Incorporated, et al. |
Docketed: | June 7, 2017 |
Linked with 16A879 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (15-20225) |
Decision Date: | January 3, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 06 2017 | Application (16A879) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 3, 2017 to June 2, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Mar 13 2017 | Application (16A879) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 2, 2017. |
Jun 02 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 7, 2017) |
Jun 09 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 7, 2017. |
Jun 20 2017 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for respondents. |
Jun 20 2017 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners. |
Jul 05 2017 | Brief amici curiae of International Law Scholars filed. |
Jul 07 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Professors of Legal History Barbara Aronstein Black, et al. filed. |
Aug 07 2017 | Brief of respondents Kellogg Brown & Root, et al. in opposition filed. |
Aug 21 2017 | Reply of petitioners Ramchandra Adhikari, et al. filed. Distributed |
Aug 23 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. |
Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Agnieszka M. Fryszman Counsel of Record | 1100 New York Ave. Suite 500 Washington, DC 20005 afryszman@cohenmilstein.com | (202)-408-4600 |
Party name: Ramchandra Adhikari, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Warren Wayne Harris Counsel of Record | 711 Louisiana Straeet Suite 2300 Houston, TX 77002 warren.harris@bracewell.com | 713-223-2300 |
Party name: Kellogg Brown & Root, et al. | ||
Other | ||
William J. Aceves | California Western School of Law 225 Cedar Street San Diego, CA 92101 wja@cwsl.edu | (619) 515-1589 |
Party name: International Law Scholars | ||
Tyler Richard Giannini | International Human Rights Clinic Harvard Law School, Pound Hall 401 6 Everett Street, 3rd Floor Cambridge, MA 02138 giannini@law.harvard.edu | (617) 495-9263 |
Party name: Professors of Legal History Barbara Aronstein Black, et al. |