No. 16-1458
Title:Eileen Hernandez, et al., Petitioners
v.
Lualhati Crespo, et al.
Docketed:June 6, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC15-67)
   Decision Date:December 22, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 27, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 26 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2017)
Jun 13 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 7, 2017.
Jul 26 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 22, 2017.
Aug 22 2017Brief of respondents Lualhati Crespo, et al. in opposition filed.
Sep 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 06 2017Reply of petitioners EileenHernandez, et al. filed. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Erik Pelletier Bartenhagen
    Counsel of Record
799 Brickell Avenue, Suite 900
Miami, FL 33131

ebartenhagen@mhickslaw.com
(305) 374-8171
Party name: EileenHernandez, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Bryan S. Gowdy
    Counsel of Record
Creed & Gowdy, P.A.
865 May Street
Jacksonville, FL 32204

bgowdy@appellate-firm.com
(904) 350-0075
Party name: Lualhati Crespo, et al.
Jessie L. Harrell
    Counsel of Record
Creed & Gowdy, P.A.
865 May Street
Jacksonville, FL 32204

jharrell@appellate-firm.com
(904)-350-0075
Party name: Lualhati Crespo, et al.