No. 16-1456
Title:David Opalinski, et al., Petitioners
v.
Robert Half International, Inc., et al.
Docketed:June 6, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-4001)
   Decision Date:January 30, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 6, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2017)
Jun 09 2017Waiver of right of respondents Robert Half International, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Jul 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Aug 28 2017Response Requested.(Due September 27, 2017)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Shannon Liss-Riordan
    Counsel of Record
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
729 Boylston Street
Ste. 2000
Boston, MA 02116

sliss@llrlaw.com
(617)-994-5800
Party name: David Opalinski, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard L. Alfred
    Counsel of Record
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
Two Seaport Lane
Suite 300
Boston, MA 02210

ralfred@seyfarth.com
(617) 946-4800
Party name: Robert Half International, Inc., et al.