No. 16-1450
Vide 16-1323
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Supreme Court of New Mexico, et al.
Docketed:June 6, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-2037, 14-2049)
   Decision Date:June 7, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:December 2, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 05 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2017)
Jun 29 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 7, 2017.
Aug 07 2017Response to petition from respondents Supreme Court of New Mexico, et al. filed.
Aug 23 2017Reply of petitioner United States filed.
Aug 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: United States
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul R.Q. Wolfson
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington , DC 20006

paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: Supreme Court of New Mexico, et al.
Paul Reinherz Quitman Wolfson
    Counsel of Record
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20006

paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: Supreme Court of New Mexico, et al.