No. 16-1445
Title:Ashram Seepersad, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 6, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3771)
   Decision Date:January 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 3, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2017)
Jun 12 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Jun 14 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jun 26 2017Response Requested. (Due July 26, 2017)
Aug 02 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 1, 2017.
Sep 01 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 2, 2017.
Sep 27 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 1, 2017.
Nov 01 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Nov 16 2017Reply of ASHRAM SEEPERSAD submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rion O'Neal Latimore
    Counsel of Record
Latimore Esq. LLC
2751 Hennepin Ave. South STE 10
Minneapolis, MN 55408

latimore@gmail.com
5132931119
Party name: ASHRAM SEEPERSAD
Rion O'Neal Latimore
    Counsel of Record
2751 Hennepin Ave. South STE 10
Minneapolis, MN 55408

LATIMORE@gmail.com
513 293 1119
Party name: Ashram Seepersad
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States