No. 16-1436
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Petitioners
v.
International Refugee Assistance Project, et al.
Docketed:June 2, 2017
Linked with 16A1190, 17A132
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1351)
   Decision Date:May 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed.
Jun 01 2017Application (16A1190) for a stay pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jun 02 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Petitioner.
Jun 02 2017The respondents are directed to file a response to the petition for a writ of certiorari on or before 3 p.m., Monday, June 12, 2017.
Jun 02 2017Response to application due on or before 3 p.m., Monday, June 12, 2017.
Jun 02 2017Application (16A1190) referred to the Court.
Jun 05 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed.
Jun 09 2017Brief amici curiae of Public Policy Legal Institute, et al. filed.
Jun 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of T.A. in support of respondent filed.
Jun 09 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by Association of American Medical Colleges and Others in support of respondents.
Jun 09 2017Motion (16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by American Center for Law and Justice in support of petitioners.
Jun 09 2017Brief amici curiae of Association of American Medical Colleges and Others in support of respondents filed.
Jun 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of Susan Abeles in support of neither party filed.
Jun 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice in support of petitioners filed.
Jun 09 2017Motion (16A1190) for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Center for Law and Justice in support of petitioners.
Jun 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle in support neither party filed.
Jun 12 2017Brief of respondents International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. in opposition filed.
Jun 12 2017Response to application from respondents International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. filed.
Jun 12 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Citizens United, et al. in support of petitioners.
Jun 12 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party.
Jun 12 2017Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Jun 12 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Constitutional Law Scholars in support of respondents.
Jun 12 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The States of New York, et al. in support of respondents.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amicus brief filed by Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Inc. in support of petitioners.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by The States of Virginia, et al.in opposition to the stay applications.
Jun 12 2017Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Inc. filed in support of petitioners.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190) for leave to file amici brief filed by Citizens United, et al.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligious Organizations.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1191) for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children in support of respondents.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief by Former National Security Officials in support of respondents.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed by Constitutional law scholars in support respondents.
Jun 12 2017Motion (16A1190, 16A1191) for leave to file amici brief filed Former National Security Officials in support respondents.
Jun 12 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute.
Jun 14 2017Reply of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Jun 14 2017Reply of applicants Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Jun 20 2017Supplemental brief of respondents International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. filed.
Jun 24 2017Letter of respondents International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. received. (Distributed)
Jun 25 2017Letter of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. received. (Distributed)
Jun 26 2017Application (16A1190) and application (16A1191) are GRANTED IN PART. In addition, application (16A1191) is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari. The petitions for writs of certiorari in 16-1436 and 16-1540 are GRANTED and the cases are consolidated for argument. In addition to the issues identified in the petitions, the parties are directed to address the following question: "Whether the challenges to Sec. 2(c) became moot on June 14, 2017." Justice Thomas, with whom Justice Alito and Justice Gorsuch join, concurring in part and dissenting in part. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion). VIDED.
Jun 26 2017The due dates for the briefs on the merits in 16-1436 and 16-1540 are as provided for by Rule 25 of the Rules of this Court. VIDED.
Jun 27 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute GRANTED.
Jun 27 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Citizens United, et al. GRANTED.
Jun 27 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The States of New York, et al. GRANTED.
Jun 27 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Constitutional Law Scholars GRANTED.
Jun 27 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty GRANTED.
Jul 17 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or neither party from counsel for the petitioners. VIDED
Jul 19 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 10, 2017. VIDED.
Jul 26 2017Application (17A132) of Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. to file a consolidated petitioners' brief on the merits and a consolidated reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limits, submitted to The Chief Justice. VIDED.
Jul 31 2017Application (17A132) granted by The Chief Justice to file a consolidated petitioners' brief on the merits and a consolidated reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limits. VIDED.
Aug 01 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Aug 03 2017Brief amici curiae of Public Policy Legal Institute and Center for Competitive Politics in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Aug 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Criminal Justice Legal Foundation in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Aug 09 2017Amicus brief of Public Policy Legal Institute and Center for Competitive Politics in support of neither party submitted.
Aug 10 2017Joint appendix filed (3 volumes). VIDED.
Aug 10 2017Brief of petitioners Trump, President of U.S., et al. filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017CIRCULATED..
Aug 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of Professor Victor Williams filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 16 2017Motion for divided argument filed by respondents. VIDED.
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Foundation for Moral Law. VIDED.
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Rights Union filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Zionist Organization of America filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of National Security Experts Andrew C. McCarthy, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Mormon History & Law in support of neither party filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 17 2017Brief amici curiae of American Legislators in Support of Judicial Restraint filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Aug 21 2017Amicus brief of Foundation for Moral Law submitted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Trump, President of U.S., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Omar Cassim Jadwat
    Counsel of Record
125 Broad Street
18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

ojadwat@aclu.org
(212) 549-2500
Party name: Int'l Refugee Assistance, et al.
Neal Kumar KatyalHogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
(202) 637-5600
Party name: Hawaii, et al.
Other
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
1 Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
John Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Barnaby W. Zall
    Counsel of Record
685 Spring St. #314
Friday Harbor, WA 98250

bzall@bzall.com
360-378-6600
Party name: Public Policy Legal Institute and Center for Competitive Politics in support of neither party
Elizabeth Ann Berney633 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10017

liz@zoa.org
212-481-1500
Party name: Zionist Organization of America
Richard D. BernsteinWillkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
1875 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

rbernstein@willkie.com
(202) 303-1100
Party name: T.A. in support of respondent
David C. BoyleP.O. Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
William Spencer Consovoy3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

will@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Christopher J. Hajec25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

chaiec@irli.org
202-232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Lawrence J. Joseph1250 Connecticut Avenue
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20036

lj@larryjoseph.com
202-355-9452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Roberta A. KaplanPaul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019-6064

rkaplan@paulweiss.com
(212) 373-3000
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars
Scott A. KellerOffice of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 Capitol Station (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
(512) 936-1700
Party name: The States of Texas, et al.
Kenneth Alan Klukowski3213 Duke Street #625
Alexandria, VA 22314

kklukowski@theacru.org
877-730-2278
Party name: American Civil Rights Union
Harold Hongju KohRule of Law Clinic
Yale Law School
127 Wall Street, P.O. Box 208215
New Haven, CT 06520-8215

harold.koh@yale.edu
(203) 432-4932
Party name: Former National Security Officials
Nathan LewinLewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th Street, NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
(202) 828-1000
Party name: Susan Abeles
Anna-Rose Mathieson96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

annarose@calapplaw.com
415-649-6700
Party name: Scholars of Mormon History & Law in support of neither party
Erin Elizabeth Mersino5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Lansing, MI 48917

contact@greatlakesjc.org
517-322-3207
Party name: American Legislators in Support of Judicial Restraint
William Jeffrey Olson370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Citizens United, et al.
Mark Leonard Rienzi1200 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

mrienzi@becketlaw.org
202-955-0095
Party name: Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party
Joshua David RogaczewskiMcDermott Will & Emery, LLP
The McDermott Building, 500 North Capitol Street, Northwest
Washington, DC 20001

jrogaczewski@mwe.com
202-756-8195
Party name: Association of American Medical Colleges and Others in support of respondents
Kent Stephen Scheidegger2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

briefs@cjlf.org
916-446-0345
Party name: The Criminal Justice Legal Foundation in support of neither party
Jay Alan SekulowAmerican Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202) 546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Herbert W. TitusWilliam J. Olson, PC
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180 - 5615

wjo@mindspring.com
(703) 356-5070
Party name: Citizens United, et al.
Barbara D. UnderwoodOffice of the Attorney General
120 Broadway, 25th Floor
New York, NY 10271-0332

barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
(212) 416-8020
Party name: The States of New York, et al.
Victor Keith WilliamsAmerica First Lawyers Association
5209 Baltimore Ave.
Bethesda, MD 20816

americafirstlawyers@gmail.com
(301) 951-9045
Party name: Professor Victor Williams
David Eliezer Yerushalmi2020 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 189
Washington, DC 20006

dyerushalmi@americanfreedomlawcenter.org
(646)-262-0500
Party name: National Security Experts Andrew C. McCarthy, et al.