No. 16-1435
Title:Minnesota Voters Alliance, et al., Petitioners
v.
Joe Mansky, et al.
Docketed:June 2, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1682, 15-1741)
   Decision Date:February 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 30 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 3, 2017)
May 30 2017Letter pursuant to Rule 12.6 from counsel for petitioners received.
Jun 08 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
Jun 12 2017Waiver of right of respondent Steve Simon, in his official capacity as Minnesota Secretary of State to respond filed.
Jun 15 2017Waiver of right of respondent Joe Mansky, et al. to respond filed.
Jul 03 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Cato Institute, et al.
Jul 03 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Center for Competitive Politics.
Jul 03 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The American Civil Rights Union, et al.
Jul 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Aug 04 2017Response Requested. (Due September 5, 2017)
Sep 01 2017Brief of respondents Joe Mansky, et al. in opposition filed.
Sep 14 2017Reply of petitioners Minnesota Voters Alliance, et al. filed.
Sep 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 23 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017.
Nov 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017.
Nov 13 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Cato Institute, et al. GRANTED.
Nov 13 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The American Civil Rights Union, et al. GRANTED.
Nov 13 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Center fo Competitive Politics GRANTED.
Nov 13 2017Petition GRANTED.
Nov 27 2017Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Nov 27 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Minnesota Voters Alliance, et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 29 2017Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including January 5, 2018.
Dec 07 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Joe Mansky, et al.
Blanket Consent
Dec 20 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, February 28, 2018
Jan 05 2018CIRCULATED
Jan 05 2018Brief of petitioners Minnesota Voters Alliance, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 10 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit.
Jan 10 2018Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Justice and Freedom Fund filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of James Madison Center for Free Speech, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Rights Union, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union; American Civil Liberties Union of Minnesota filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Jan 17 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit. (1 Box).
Feb 05 2018Brief of respondents Joe Mansky, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2018Brief amici curiae of Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law, The League of Women Voters of the United States and The League of Women Voters Minnesota filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2018Brief amicus curiae of Campaign Legal Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, U.S. Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, and International Municipal Lawyers Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Tennessee, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Michigan, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Rhode Island, Texas, and Utah filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2018Reply of petitioners Minnesota Voters Alliance, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Argued. For petitioners: J. David Breemer, Sacramento, Cal. For respondents: Daniel Rogan, Assistant Hennepin County Attorney, Minneapolis, Minn.
Jun 14 2018Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Kennedy, Thomas, Ginsburg, Alito, Kagan, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined. Sotomayor, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer, J., joined.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
J. David Breemer
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

jbreemer@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Minnesota Voters Alliance, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Nathan Hartshorn
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
445 Minnesota Street, Suite 1800
Saint Paul, MN 55101-2134

nathan.hartshorn@ag.state.mn.us
(651) 757-1252
Party name: Steve Simon, in his official capacity as Minnesota Secretary of State
Daniel Patrick Rogan
    Counsel of Record
Hennepin County Attorney's Office
A-2000 Government Center
Minneapolis, MN 55487

daniel.rogan@hennepin.us
612-348-5529
Party name: Joe Mansky, et al.
Other
Andree Kahn Blumstein
    Counsel of Record
State of Tennessee, Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

andree.blumstein@ag.tn.gov
615-741-3492
Party name: States of Tennessee, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Michigan, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Rhode Island, Texas, and Utah
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: James Madison Center for Free Speech, Inc.
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union; American Civil Liberties Union of Minnesota
Allen Joseph Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
Center for Competitive Politics
124 S. West Street
Suite 201
Alexandria, VA 22314

adickerson@campaignfreedom.org
(703)-894-6800
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
2255 Sewell Mill Road, Suite 320
Marietta, GA 30062

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al.
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
505 S. Villa Real Drive
Suite 208
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
(714) 283-8880
Party name: Justice and Freedom Fund
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP
1170 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA 30309

jjp@sbllaw.net
(678)-347-2208
Party name: The American Civil Rights Union, et al.
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3233
Party name: National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, U.S. Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, and International Municipal Lawyers Association
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Scharf-Norton Center for Constitutional Litigation
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

tsandefur@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

(202)-842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.
Paul March Smith
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1411 K Street, NW, Suite 1400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
202-736-2200
Party name: Campaign Legal Center
Daniel Isaac Weiner
    Counsel of Record
Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law
120 Broadway
Suite 1700
New York, NY 10271

weinerd@brennan.law.nyu.edu
646-292-8383
Party name: Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law, The League of Women Voters of the United States and The League of Women Voters Minnesota