No. 16-1432
Title:Ashley Sveen, et al., Petitioners
v.
Kaye Melin, et al.
Docketed:June 1, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1172)
   Decision Date:April 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 3, 2017)
Jun 05 2017Waiver of right of respondent Kaye Melin to respond filed.
Jul 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Aug 01 2017Response Requested. (Due August 31, 2017)
Aug 16 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 29, 2017.
Sep 29 2017Brief of respondent Kaye Melin in opposition filed.
Oct 06 2017Reply of petitioners Ashley Sveen, et al. filed.
Oct 18 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017.
Oct 23 2017Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

aunikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Ashley Sveen, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
(202)-879-3939
Party name: Kaye Melin
Robert John Lange
    Counsel of Record
Lange Law Firm, P.A.
7201 W. 78th Street
Suite 207
Bloomington, MN 55439

Bob@LawyerBob.com
(952)-837-1900
Party name: Kaye Melin