No. 16-1424 | |
Title: | Brian Foster, Petitioner v. Robert L. Tatum |
Docketed: | May 31, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (14-3343) |
Decision Date: | January 31, 2017 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 1, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 30 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 30, 2017) |
Jun 18 2017 | Supplemental brief of respondent Robert L. Tatum filed. |
Jun 29 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Robert L. Tatum to respond filed. |
Jul 05 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. |
Jul 13 2017 | Response Requested. (Due August 14, 2017) |
Jul 20 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 14, 2017. |
Sep 12 2017 | Brief of respondent Robert L. Tatum in opposition filed. |
Sep 12 2017 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Robert L. Tatum. |
Sep 19 2017 | Supplemental brief of respondent Robert L. Tatum filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 27 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017. |
Sep 27 2017 | Reply of petitioner Brian Foster filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 16 2017 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Oct 16 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Misha Tseytlin Counsel of Record | 17 W. Main Street Madison, WI 53703 mishatseytlin@gmail.com | 608 267-9323 |
Party name: Brian Foster | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Keri A. Ambrosio Counsel of Record | 53 W. Jackson Blvd.Suite 626 Chicago, IL 60604 keri@ambrosiolegal.com | (312) 961-3261 |
Party name: Robert L. Tatum | ||
Robert L. Tatum | 574254 2833 Riverside Dr., (TC TU) P.O. Box 19033 Green Bay, WI 54307-9033 | |
Party name: Robert L. Tatum |