No. 16-1422
Title:In Re Joseph M. Arpaio, Petitioner
Docketed:May 30, 2017
Linked with 17A26
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2017Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due June 29, 2017)
May 24 2017Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of mandamus filed by petitioner.
Jun 06 2017Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 26 2017Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioner DENIED.
Jun 27 2017Application (17A26) for a stay of proceedings pending disposition of the petition for a writ of mandamus, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jun 29 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jul 05 2017Application (17A26) denied by Justice Kennedy.
Jul 11 2017Reply of petitioner filed.
Jul 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Aug 16 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner In Re: Joseph M. Arpaio filed. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark David Goldman
    Counsel of Record
Goldman & Zwillinger, PLLC
17851 N. 85th Street, Suite 175
Scottsdale, AZ 85255

mgoldman@gzlawoffice.com
480-626-8483
Party name:
Mark David Goldman
    Counsel of Record
17851 N. 85th Street, Suite 175
Scottsdale, AZ 85255

mgoldman@gzlawoffice.com
480-626-8483
Party name: In Re: Joseph M. Arpaio
Dennis I. WilenchikWilenchik & Bartness, P.C.
2810 North Third Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004

diw@wb-law.com
(602) 606-2810
Party name:
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: