No. 16-1409
Title:Samantha Milby, Petitioner
v.
MCMC LLC
Docketed:May 25, 2017
Linked with 16A883
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-5483)
   Decision Date:December 22, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 07 2017Application (16A883) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 22, 2017 to May 21, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Mar 09 2017Application (16A883) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 21, 2017.
May 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 26, 2017)
Jun 19 2017Waiver of right of respondent MCMC LLC to respond filed.
Jul 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jul 14 2017Response Requested. (Due August 14, 2017)
Aug 11 2017Brief of respondent MCMC LLC in opposition filed.
Aug 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael D. Grabhorn
    Counsel of Record
Grabhorn Law Office, PLLC
2525 Nelson Miller Parkway
Suite 107
Louisville, KY 40223

m.grabhorn@grabhornlaw.com
(502) 244-9331
Party name: Samantha Milby
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew W. Breetz
    Counsel of Record
Sites & Harbison, PLLC
400 West Market Street
Suite 1800
Louisville, KY 40202

mbreetz@sites.com
(502) 587-3400
Party name: MCMC LLC
Matthew W. Breetz
    Counsel of Record
400 West Market Street
Suite 1800
Louisville, KY 40202-3352

mbreetz@stites.com
502-587-3400
Party name: MCMC LLC