No. 16-1406
Title:Correctional Medical Services, Inc., nka Corizon, Petitioner
v.
Alma Glisson, Personal Representative of the Estate of Nicholas L. Glisson
Docketed:May 25, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1419)
   Decision Date:February 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 26, 2017)
Jun 21 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 26, 2017.
Jun 26 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cook County filed.
Jul 26 2017Brief of respondent Alma Glisson, Personal Representative of the Estate of Nicholas L. Glisson in opposition filed.
Aug 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael B. Brennan
    Counsel of Record
Gass Weber Mullins LLC
241 North Broadway
Suite 300
Milwaukee, WI 53202

brennan@gwmlaw.com
(414) 223-3300
Party name: Correctional Medical Services, Inc., nka Corizon
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Keaney Sutherlin
    Counsel of Record
Sutherlin & Associates
403 E. Wabash Avenue
Crawfordsville, IN 47933

msutherlin@gmail.com
3176346313
Party name: Alma Glisson
Other
Paul A. CastiglioneAssistant State's Attorney
State's Attorney's Office of Cook County, Illinois, Civil Actions Bureau
500 Richard J. Daley Center
Chicago, IL 60602

paul.castiglione@cookcountyil.gov
(312) 603-2350
Party name: Cook County