No. 16-1400
Title:Nicholas Jay Wilson, Petitioner
v.
Department of the Navy
Docketed:May 24, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2015-3225)
   Decision Date:December 7, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 23, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 23, 2017)
Jun 26 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 24, 2017.
Jul 24 2017Brief of respondent Department of the Navy in opposition filed.
Aug 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew August LeFande
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law PLLC
4585 North 25th Road
Arlington, VA 22207

matt@lefande.com
(202) 657-5800
Party name: Nicholas Jay Wilson
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of the Navy