No. 16-1398
Title:Victaulic Company, Petitioner
v.
United States, ex rel. Customs Fraud Investigations, LLC
Docketed:May 23, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2169)
   Decision Date:October 5, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 22, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 23 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 22, 2017)
Jun 13 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 24, 2017.
Jun 22 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Association of Exporters and Importers filed.
Jun 22 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Jul 24 2017Brief of respondent United States, ex rel. Customs Fraud Investigations, LLC in opposition filed.
Aug 01 2017Supplemental brief of respondent United States, ex rel. Customs Fraud Investigations, LLC filed.
Aug 08 2017Reply of petitioner Victaulic Co. filed. (Distributed)
Aug 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Charles Hill
    Counsel of Record
1200 17th St, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

thomas.hill@pillsburylaw.com
(202)-663-8000
Party name: Victaulic Co.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jonathan K. Tycko
    Counsel of Record
1828 L Street, N.W., Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036

jtycko@tzlegal.com
202-973-0900
Party name: United States, ex rel. Customs Fraud Investigations, LLC
Other
Douglas W. BaruchFried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
801 17th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

douglas.baruch@friedfrank.com
(202) 639-7000
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers
Joseph Martin SpraragenGrunfeld, Desiderio, Lebowitz, Silverman & Klestadt, LLP
599 Lexington Avenue, 36th Fl.
New York, NY 10022

jspraragen@gdlsk.com
212-557-4000
Party name: American Association of Exporters and Importers