No. 16-1386
Title:Susan L. Vaughan, Petitioner
v.
Anderson Regional Medical Center
Docketed:May 22, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-60104)
   Decision Date:February 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 21, 2017)
Jun 13 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 21, 2017.
Jun 14 2017Brief amici curiae of AARP and AARP Foundation filed.
Jul 20 2017Brief of respondent Anderson Regional Medical Center in opposition filed.
Aug 04 2017Reply of petitioner Susan L. Vaughan filed.
Aug 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert N. Norris
    Counsel of Record
1880 Lakeland Drive, Suite G
Jackson, MS 39216

nick@watsonnorris.com
(601)-968-0000
Party name: Vaughan, Susan L.
Robert Nicholas Norris
    Counsel of Record
Watson & Norris, PLLC
1880 Lakeland Drive, Suite G
Jackson, MS 39216

nick@watsonnorris.com
(601) 968-0000
Party name: Susan L. Vaughan
Attorneys for Respondent
Romney Hastings Entrekin
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell & Lacey, P.A.
535 North Fifth Avenue, Post Office Box 1289
Laurel, MS 39441-1289

entrekin@beolaw.com
601-649-4440
Party name: Anderson Regional Medical Center
Benjamin B. MorganBurson Entrekin Orr
P.O. Box 1289
Laurel, MS 39441-4441

morgan@beolaw.com
601.649.4440
Party name: Anderson Regional Medical Center
Other
Daniel B. KohrmanAARP Foundation Litigation
601 E Street, NW
Washington, DC 20049

(202) 434-2060
Party name: AARP and AARP Foundation