No. 16-1373
Title:Ryan Brown, Petitioner
v.
Randall Haas, Warden
Docketed:May 16, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1823)
   Decision Date:January 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 15, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 15, 2017)
May 30 2017Waiver of right of respondent Randall Haas, Warden to respond filed.
Jun 14 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jun 19 2017Response Requested. (Due July 19, 2017)
Jul 14 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 18, 2017.
Aug 18 2017Brief of respondent Randall Haas, Warden in opposition filed.
Sep 01 2017Reply of petitioner Ryan Brown filed.
Sep 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rajiv Mohan
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

rmohan@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Ryan Brown
Rajiv Mohan
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

rmohan@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Ryan Brown
Attorneys for Respondent
Aaron D. Lindstrom Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

517-373-1124
Party name: Warden Haas
Aaron D. Lindstrom
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

LindstromA@michigan.gov
(517) 373-1124
Party name: Randall Haas, Warden