No. 16-1371
Title:Terrence Byrd, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 16, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1509)
   Decision Date:February 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 11 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 15, 2017)
Jun 08 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 17, 2017.
Jun 12 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association fro Public Defense filed.
Jul 17 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Aug 01 2017Reply of petitioner Terrence Byrd filed. (Distributed)
Aug 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 28 2017Petition GRANTED.
Nov 13 2017Brief of petitioner Terrence Byrd filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2017Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of Southwestern Law Student Lindsey N. Ursua, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of Restore the Fourth, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, January 9, 2018
Nov 20 2017Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union and The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Motorists Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Brief amici curiae of National Ass'n for Public Defense and the National Ass'n of Federal Defenders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Nov 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center(EPIC), et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Amicus brief of Morgan A. Cloud submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Amicus brief of Fourth Amendment Scholars submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2017CIRCULATED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
(212)-506-5000
Party name: TerrenceByrd
Heidi Rae FreeseOffice of the Federal Public Defender
Middle District of Pennsylvania
100 Chestnut Street, Suite 306
Harrisburg, PA 17101

haidi_freese@fd.org
(717) 782-2237
Party name: TerrenceByrd
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Matthew Adams Abee
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
1320 Main Street
17th Floor
Columbia, SC 29201

Matt.Abee@nelsonmullins.com
8032559335
Party name: Fourth Amendment Scholars
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

ddebold@gibsondunn.com
2029558551
Party name: National Ass'n for Public Defense and the National Ass'n of Federal Defenders
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union and The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Aaron M. Panner
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

apanner@kellogghansen.com
2022367921
Party name: National Motorists Association
Marc Rotenberg
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center (EPIC)
1718 Connecticut Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20009

rotenberg@epic.org
202-415-6788
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center (EPIC), et al.
Sarah M. Shalf
    Counsel of Record
Emory University School of Law
Gambrell Hall
1301 Clifton Road NE
Atlanta, GA 30322-2770

sarah.shalf@emory.edu
404-712-4652
Party name: Morgan A. Cloud
Mahesha Padmanabhan Subbaraman
    Counsel of Record
Subbaraman PLLC
222 S. 9th St., Suite 1600
Minneapolis, MN 55402

mps@subblaw.com
612-315-9210
Party name: Restore the Fourth, Inc.
David J. DeboldGibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ddebold@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: National Association fro Public Defense