No. 16-1370
Title:MasTec Advanced Technologies, a Division of MasTec, Inc., Petitioner
v.
National Labor Relations Board
Docketed:May 16, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(11-1273, 11-1274, 11-1294)
   Decision Date:September 16, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 10, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 11 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 15, 2017)
Jun 08 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 17, 2017.
Jul 07 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 16, 2017.
Aug 08 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner MasTec Advanced Technologies, a Division of MasTec, Inc. filed.
Aug 16 2017Brief of respondent National Labor Relations Board in opposition filed.
Aug 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gavin S. Appleby
    Counsel of Record
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
3344 Peachtree Road, N.E.
Suite 1500
Atlanta, GA 30326

gappleby@littler.com
(404) 233-0330
Party name: MasTec Advanced Technologies, a Division of MasTec, Inc.
Gavin S. Appleby
    Counsel of Record
3344 Peachtree Rd., N.E., Suite 1500
Atlanta, GA 30326

gappleby@littler.com
404-233-0330
Party name: MasTec Advanced Technologies
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: National Labor Relations Board