No. 16-1369
Title:Arizona, Petitioner
v.
Sandra L. Bahr, et al.
Docketed:May 16, 2017
Linked with 16A885
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-72327)
   Decision Date:September 12, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:January 9, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 07 2017Application (16A885) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 9, 2017 to May 10, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Mar 10 2017Application (16A885) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until May 10, 2017.
May 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 15, 2017)
May 22 2017Waiver of right of respondents Sandra L. Bahr, et al. to respond filed.
Jun 09 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 17, 2017.
Jun 15 2017Brief amici curiae of South Coast Air Quality Management District, et al. filed.
Jul 13 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 29, 2017.
Aug 29 2017Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed.
Sep 08 2017Reply of petitioner Arizona filed.
Sep 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Sep 26 2017Response Requested. (Due October 26, 2017)
Oct 12 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 30, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dominic Emil Draye
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1275 W. Washington Street
Phoenix, AZ 85007

solicitorgeneral@azag.gov
(602) 542-3333
Party name: Arizona
Attorneys for Respondents
James A. Feldman
    Counsel of Record
University of Pennsylvania Law School
3501 Sansom Street
Philadelphia, PA 19104

jfeldman@law.upenn.edu
(215) 746-2297
Party name: Sandra L. Bahr, et al.
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondents
Other
Barbara Beth BairdSouth Coast Air Quality Management District
21865 Copley Drive
Diamond Bar, CA 91765

bbaird@aqmd.gov
(909) 396-2302
Party name: South Coast Air Quality Management District, et al.