No. 16-1365
Title:Lee Jason Kibler, dba DJ Logic, Petitioner
v.
Robert Bryson Hall, et al.
Docketed:May 15, 2017
Linked with 16A856
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2516)
   Decision Date:December 13, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 27 2017Application (16A856) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 13, 2017 to May 12, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Mar 01 2017Application (16A856) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 12, 2017.
May 12 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 14, 2017)
May 22 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 14, 2017, for all respondents.
Jul 14 2017Brief of respondents Robert Bryson Hall, et al. in opposition filed.
Jul 27 2017Reply of petitioner Lee Jason Kibler, dba DJ Logic filed.
Aug 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Al J. Daniel Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Daniel Law PLLC
305 Broadway
7th Floor
New York, NY 10007

ajd@daniellawpllc.com
(212) 721-0902
Party name: Lee Jason Kibler, dba DJ Logic
Attorneys for Respondents
Ira S. Sacks
    Counsel of Record
Akerman LLP
666 Fifth avenue, 20th Floor
New York, NY 10103

ira.sacks@akerman.com
(212) 880-3800
Party name: Robert Bryson Hall, et al.
Eric J. Shimanoff
    Counsel of Record
Cowan, Liebowitz & Latman
114 West 47th Street
New York, NY 10036

(212) 790-9200
Party name: UMG Recordings, Inc., dba Def Jam Recordings