No. 16-1362
Title:Encino Motorcars, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Hector Navarro, et al.
Docketed:May 12, 2017
Linked with 16A940
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-55323)
   Decision Date:January 9, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 30 2017Application (16A940) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 9, 2017 to May 10, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Apr 03 2017Application (16A940) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until May 10, 2017.
May 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 12, 2017)
May 19 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 24, 2017.
Jun 12 2017Brief amici curiae of National Automobile Dealers Association, et al. filed.
Jul 21 2017Brief of respondents Hector Navarro, et al. in opposition filed.
Aug 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 09 2017Reply of petitioner Encino Motorcars, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Sep 28 2017Petition GRANTED.
Oct 26 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Encino Motorcars, LLC
Oct 26 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Hector Navarro, et al.
Nov 01 2017Joint appendix filed.
Nov 01 2017Brief of petitioner Encino Motorcars, LLC filed.
Nov 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Nov 08 2017Brief amici curiae of National Automobile Dealers Association and State Automobile Dealers Associations for Alaska, et al. filed.
Nov 08 2017The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including December 8, 2017.
Nov 17 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, January 17, 2018
Nov 22 2017CIRCULATED.
Dec 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Employment Lawyers Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Law Professors James Brudney, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2017Brief of respondents Hector Navarro, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2017Brief amici curiae of U.S. SENATORS PATTY MURRAY, SHERROD BROWN, AND JACK REED filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Dec 19 2017The record for the U.S.C.A. is electronic and located on PACER.
Jan 08 2018Reply of petitioner Encino Motorcars, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2018Argued. For petitioner: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For respondents: James A. Feldman, Philadelphia, Pa.
Apr 02 2018Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Thomas, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Alito, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined. Ginsburg, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ. joined.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis, LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
202-879-5000
Party name: Encino Motorcars, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
James A. Feldman
    Counsel of Record
University of Pennsylvania Law School
3501 Sansom St.
Philadelphia, PA 19104-6204

jfeldma@law.upenn.edu
202-730-1267
Party name: Hector Navarro, et al.
Stephanos BibasUniversity of Pennsylvania Law School
3501 Sansom St.
Philadelphia, PA 19104-6204

stephanos.bibas@gmail.com
2157462297
Party name: Hector Navarro, et al.
Other
Michael L. Foreman
    Counsel of Record
Penn State Law - Civil Rights Rights Appellate Clinic
329 Innovation Blvd., Suite 118
University Park, PA 16803

mlf25@psu.edu
814-865-3832
Party name: National Employment Lawyers Association
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Law Professors James Brudney, et al.
Matthew W. Lampe
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
250 Vesey Street
New York, NY 10281

mwlampe@jonesday.com
212-326-3939
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Felicia R. Reid
    Counsel of Record
505 Montgomery Street
Suite 1300
San Francisco, CA 94111

freid@hkemploymentlaw.com
(415)-835-9000
Party name: National Automobile Dealers Association and State Automobile Dealers Associations for Alaska, et al.
David A. Rosenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Weinberg, Roger & Rosenfeld
1001 Marina Village Parkway
Suite 200
Alameda, CA 94501

drosenfeld@unioncounsel.net
(510) 337-1001
Party name: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO
Daniel Martin Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
750 Seventh Avenue, 26th Floor
New York, NY 10019

dsullivan@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: U.S. SENATORS PATTY MURRAY, SHERROD BROWN, AND JACK REED