No. 16-1348
Title:Michael Nelson Currier, Petitioner
v.
Virginia
Docketed:May 8, 2017
Linked with 16A810
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(160102)
   Decision Date:December 8, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 09 2017Application (16A810) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 8, 2017 to May 7, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Feb 14 2017Application (16A810) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 7, 2017.
May 08 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 7, 2017)
May 25 2017Waiver of right of respondent Virginia to respond filed.
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Jun 13 2017Response Requested. (Due July 13, 2017)
Jun 21 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 10, 2017.
Aug 04 2017Brief of respondent Virginia in opposition filed.
Aug 15 2017Reply of petitioner Michael N.Currier filed.
Aug 16 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 25 2017Record Requested.
Sep 29 2017Record received from the Supreme Court of Virginia (4 volumes).
Oct 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 16 2017Petition GRANTED.
Nov 13 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Michael N.Currier
Blanket Consent
Nov 16 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Virginia
Blanket Consent
Nov 30 2017Brief of petitioner Michael N.Currier filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2017Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, February 20, 2018
Jan 02 2018Brief of respondent Virginia filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jan 05 2018CIRCULATED
Jan 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 09 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 09 2018Brief amici curiae of State of Indiana, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2018Record requested from the Supreme Court of Virginia
Jan 22 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Feb 01 2018Reply of petitioner Michael N.Currier filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Argued. For petitioner: Jeffrey L. Fisher, Stanford, Cal. For respondent: Matthew R. McGuire, Deputy Solicitor General of Virginia, Richmond, Va.; and Erica L. Ross, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School
Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
650-724-7081
Party name: Michael N.Currier
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew Robert McGuire
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

mmcguire@oag.state.va.us
804-786-7773
Party name: Virginia
Other
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

ddebold@gibsondunn.com
2029558551
Party name: Cato Institute
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
Indiana Government Center South, 5th Floor
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
R. Stanton Jones
    Counsel of Record
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

stanton.jones@apks.com
202-942-5000
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
R. Stanton JonesArnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001-3743

stanton.jones@apks.com
(202) 942-5000
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers