No. 16-1344
Title:David Nosal, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 5, 2017
Linked with 16A840
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-10037, 14-10275)
   Decision Date:July 5, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:December 8, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 21 2017Application (16A840) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 8, 2017 to April 7, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Feb 24 2017Application (16A840) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until April 7, 2017.
Mar 16 2017Application (16A840) to extend further the time from April 7, 2017 to May 5, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Mar 24 2017Application (16A840) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until May 5, 2017.
May 05 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 5, 2017)
Jun 02 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 5, 2017.
Jun 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation filed.
Jun 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Sergey Bratus, et al. filed.
Jun 29 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 4, 2017.
Jul 27 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 5, 2017.
Sep 05 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Sep 19 2017Reply of petitioner David Nosal filed.
Sep 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
(202) 637-5600
Party name: David Nosal
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Roy I. Liebman460 West 34th Street, 4th Floor
New York, NY 10001

rliebman@counselpress.com
(212) 685-9800
Party name: Sergey Bratus, et al.
Jamie Lee WilliamsElectronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

jamie@eff.org
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation