No. 16-1337
Title:Donte Lamar Jones, Petitioner
v.
Virginia
Docketed:May 5, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(131385)
   Decision Date:February 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 03 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 5, 2017)
May 25 2017Waiver of right of respondent Virginia to respond filed.
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 12 2017Response Requested. (Due July 12, 2017)
Jun 29 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 11, 2017.
Aug 10 2017Brief of respondent Virginia in opposition filed.
Aug 24 2017Reply of petitioner Donte L. Jones filed.
Aug 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Duke K. McCall II
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

duke.mccall@morganlewis.com
202-739-3000
Party name: Donte L. Jones
Duke K. McCall III.
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

duke.mccall@morganlewis.com
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Donte Lamar Jones
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew R. McGuire
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

mmcguire@oag.state.va.us
804-786-7773
Party name: Virginia
Trevor Stephen CoxOffic of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

tcox@oag.state.va.us
804-786-7704
Party name: Virginia