No. 16-1330
Title:Charles M. Ivey, III, Petitioner
v.
First Citizens Bank & Trust Company
Docketed:May 5, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2209)
   Decision Date:January 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 5, 2017)
May 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 5, 2017.
Jun 28 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 4, 2017.
Aug 02 2017Brief of respondent First Citizens Bank & Trust Company in opposition filed.
Aug 16 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 17 2017Reply of petitioner Charles M. Ivey filed. (Distributed)
Sep 21 2017Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
6688 N. Central Expy., Suite 1650
#51B
Dallas, TX 75206

214-396-6634
Party name: Charles M. Ivey
Attorneys for Respondent
Gary J. Rickner
    Counsel of Record
Ward and Smith, P.A.
5430 Wade Park Boulevard, Suite 400
P.O. Box 33009
Raleigh, NC 27636-3009

gjr@wardandsmith.com
(919) 277-9271
Party name: First Citizens Bank & Trust Company
Gary J. Rickner
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 33009
Ralaigh, NC 27636-3009

gjr@wardandsmith.com
919-277-9271
Party name: First Citizens Bank & Trust Company