No. 16-1323
Vide 16-1450
Title:Supreme Court of New Mexico, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:May 4, 2017
Linked with 16A789
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-2037, 14-2049)
   Decision Date:June 7, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:December 2, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 02 2017Application (16A789) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 2, 2017 to April 3, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Feb 13 2017Application (16A789) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 3, 2017.
Mar 14 2017Application (16A789) to extend further the time from April 3, 2017 to May 1, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Mar 17 2017Application (16A789) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until May 1, 2017.
May 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 5, 2017)
May 11 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
Jun 01 2017Brief amicus curiae of Association of Corporate Counsel filed.
Jun 05 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jun 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Jun 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of The American Bar Association filed.
Aug 07 2017Reply of petitioners Supreme Court of NM, et al. filed.
Aug 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul Reinherz Quitman Wolfson
    Counsel of Record
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20006

paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: Supreme Court of NM, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Lawrence S. EbnerCapital Appellate Advocacy, PLLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@capitalappellate.com
(202) 729-6337
Party name: Association of Corporate Counsel
Jeffrey T. GreenSidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Linda A. KleinPresident
American Bar Association
321 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

abapresident@americanbar.org
(312) 988-5000
Party name: The American Bar Association