No. 16-1313 | |
Title: | Seaside Farm, Inc., Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | May 1, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (15-2562) |
Decision Date: | December 2, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 31, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 01 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 31, 2017) |
May 26 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Jun 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017. |
Jun 26 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Daniel A. Speights Counsel of Record | 100 Oak Street East Post Office Box 685 Hampton, SC 29924 dspeights@speightsrunyan.com | (803)943-4444 |
Party name: Seaside Farm, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Jeffrey B. Wall Counsel of Record | Acting Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | (202) 514-2217 |
Party name: United States |