No. 16-1308
Vide 16-1438
Title:Darrell I. Bolden, Petitioner
v.
Missouri
Docketed:May 1, 2017
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Missouri, Eastern District
   Case Numbers:(ED 102965)
   Decision Date:December 6, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 28, 2017
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 27 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 31, 2017)
May 31 2017Brief of respondent Missouri in opposition filed.
Jun 13 2017Reply of petitioner Darrell I. Bolden filed.
Jun 28 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law
Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
(310) 206-8506
Party name: Darrell I. Bolden
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
(573) 751-3321
Party name: Missouri