No. 16-1307
Title:Ali Hamza Ahmad Suliman al Bahlul, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 1, 2017
Linked with 16A770
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(11-1324)
   Decision Date:October 20, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:November 28, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 27 2017Application (16A770) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 26, 2017 to March 28, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Feb 02 2017Application (16A770) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 28, 2017.
Mar 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 31, 2017)
Mar 28 2017Appendix of Ali Hamza Ahmad Suliman al Bahlul filed.
May 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 30, 2017.
May 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of Justice Richard J. Goldstone filed.
May 31 2017Brief amici curiae of International and Constitutional Law Experts filed.
May 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Institute of Military Justice filed.
May 31 2017Brief amici curiae of United States Council of Muslim Organizations, et al., filed.
May 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Rights filed.
May 31 2017Brief amici curiae of Karen Korematsu, et al. filed.
May 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of Professor Jens David Ohlin filed.
May 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of Mr. Ammar al Baluchi filed.
Jun 30 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 31, 2017.
Jul 25 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 30, 2017.
Aug 28 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 6, 2017.
Sep 06 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michel Paradis
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Defense
Military Commissions Defense Organization
1620 Defense Pentagon
Washington, DC 20301-1620

michel.paradis@osd.mil
(703) 695-4672
Party name: Ali Hamza Ahmad Suliman al Bahlul
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
James G. Connell III.Connell Law, LLC
P.O. Box 141
Cabin John, MD 20818

jcooell@connell-law.com
(703) 623-8410
Party name: Mr. Ammar al Baluchi
Gary A. IsaacMayer Brown LLP
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

gisaac@mayerbrown.com
(312) 782-0600
Party name: Karen Korematsu, et al.
Christopher B. KaczmarekOne International Place
Suite 2700
Boston, MA 02110

ckaczmarek@littler.com
617.378.6000
Party name: United States Council of Muslim Organizations, et al.,
Shayana D. KadidalCenter for Constitutional Rights
666 Broadway, 7th Floor
New York, NY 10012

kadidal@ccrjustice.org
(212) 614-6438
Party name: Center for Constitutional Rights
Jens David OhlinProfessor of Law
Cornell Law School
lthaca, NY 14853-4901

jdo43@cornell.edu
607-255-0479
Party name: Professor Jens David Ohlin
Sarah H. PaolettiUniversity of Pennsylvania School of Law
3501 Sansom Street
Philadelphia, PA 19104

paoletti@law.upenn.edu
(215) 898-8427
Party name: Justice Richard J. Goldstone
Peter R. ShultsFoley Hoag, LLP
155 Seaport Boulevard
Boston, MA 02210

pshults@foleyhoag.com
(617) 832-1000
Party name: International and Constitutional Law Experts
Stephen I. Vladeck727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

svladeck@law.utexas.edu
(512) 475-9198
Party name: National Institute of Military Justice