No. 16-1288
Title:Synopsys, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Mentor Graphics Corporation
Docketed:April 28, 2017
Linked with 16A892
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2015-1599)
   Decision Date:October 17, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:December 28, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 13 2017Application (16A892) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 28, 2017 to April 27, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Mar 15 2017Application (16A892) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 27, 2017.
Apr 27 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 30, 2017)
May 30 2017Brief of respondent Mentor Graphics Corporation in opposition filed.
May 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago in support of neither party filed.
Jun 13 2017Reply of petitioner Synopsys, Inc. filed.
Jun 14 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: Synopsys, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
John D. Vandenberg
    Counsel of Record
Klarquist Sparkman LLP
121 S.W.Salmon Street
Suite 1600
Portland, OR 97204

john.vandenberg@klarquist.com
(503)-595-5300
Party name: Mentor Graphics Corporation
Other
Meredith Martin AddyTabet DiVito & Rothstein LLC
205 South LaSalle St.
Suite 700
Chicago, IL 60604

maddy@tdrlawfirm.com
(312) 762-9468
Party name: The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago