No. 16-1285
Title:N. E., By and Through His Parents, C. E., et ux., et al., Petitioners
v.
Seattle School District
Docketed:April 27, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-35910)
   Decision Date:November 17, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:January 26, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 24 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 30, 2017)
May 30 2017Brief of respondent Seattle School District in opposition filed.
Jun 06 2017Reply of petitioners N. E., By and Through His Parents, C. E., et ux., et al. filed.
Jun 14 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Samuel R. Bagenstos
    Counsel of Record
625 South State Street
Ann Arbor, MI 48109

sbagen@gmail.com
(734) 647-7584
Party name: N. E., By and Through His Parents, C. E., et ux., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
David Todd Hokit
    Counsel of Record
Curran Law Firm, PS
555 W. Smith STreet
Kent, WA 98032

dhokit@curranfirm.com
253 852 2345
Party name: Seattle School District