No. 16-1276
Title:Digital Realty Trust, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Paul Somers
Docketed:April 25, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-17352)
   Decision Date:March 8, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 25 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 25, 2017)
May 03 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Respondent.
May 08 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 30, 2017.
May 10 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
May 24 2017Brief amici curiae of New England Legal Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
May 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. (Distributed)
May 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar filed. (Distributed)
May 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of Lime Energy Services Company filed. (Distributed)
May 26 2017Letter of May 26, 2017, from counsel for petitioner waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 received.
May 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017.
May 30 2017Brief of respondent Paul Somers in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Jun 02 2017Reply of petitioner Digital Realty Trust, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Jun 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 26 2017Petition GRANTED.
Jul 06 2017Consent the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Jul 12 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 24, 2017.
Jul 12 2017The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 10, 2017.
Jul 12 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Digital Realty Trust, Inc.
Jul 18 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent.
Aug 24 2017Brief of petitioner Digital Realty Trust, Inc. filed.
Aug 25 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Aug 29 2017Brief amici curiae of New England Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Aug 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Center for Workplace Compliance filed.
Aug 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Aug 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Aug 31 2017Brief amici curiae of Lime Energy Services Company and Prestige Cruises International filed.
Oct 06 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, November 28, 2017.
Oct 10 2017Brief of respondent Paul Somers filed.
Oct 11 2017Motion to argue pro hac vice filed by the Solicitor General.
Oct 12 2017CIRCULATED
Oct 17 2017Brief amici curiae of National Whistleblower Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 17 2017Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Oct 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Senator Charles Grassley filed. (Distributed)
Oct 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Oct 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Ethical Systems, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund filed. (Distributed)
Oct 18 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Oct 18 2017Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Nov 06 2017Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Nov 06 2017Motion to argue pro hac vice filed by the Solicitor General GRANTED.
Nov 09 2017Reply of petitioner Digital Realty Trust, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Nov 28 2017Argued. For petitioner: Kannon K. Shanmugam, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Daniel L. Geyser, Dallas, Tex.; and Christopher G. Michel, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (Pro hac vice; for United States, as amicus curiae.)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly, LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
202-434-5000
Party name: Digital Realty Trust, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Stris & Maher, LLP
Three Energy Square
6688 N. Central Expy., Suite 1650
Dallas, TX 75206

daniel.geyser@strismaher.com
214-396-6634
Party name: Paul Somers
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: the United States
Stephen M. Kohn
    Counsel of Record
Kohn, Kohn and Colapinto, LLP
3233 P Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20007

sk@kkc.com
(202) 342-6980
Party name: National Whistleblower Center, et al.
Jaime Lynne Novikoff
    Counsel of Record
NT Lakis, LLP
1501 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20005

jnovikoff@ntlakis.com
202-629-5600
Party name: The Center for Workplace Compliance
Steven J. Pearlman
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
70 W. Madison, Suite 3800
Chicago, IL 60602

spearlman@proskauer.com
312 962 3550
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Benjamin G. Robbins
    Counsel of Record
New England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111-2504

benrobbins@nelfonline.org
(617)-695-3660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation, et al.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
(202)-842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
202-362-0636
Party name: Senator Charles Grassley
Jason Paul Steed
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP
2001 Ross Avenue
Suite 4400
Dallas, TX 75201

jsteed@kilpatricktownsend.com
214-992-7112
Party name: Ethical Systems, Inc.
Claire Marie Sylvia
    Counsel of Record
Phillips & Cohen, LLP
100 The Embarcadero, Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94105

csylvia@phillipsandcohen.com
415-836-9000
Party name: Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund
Collin O'Connor Udell
    Counsel of Record
Jackson Lewis P.C.
90 State House Square, 8th Floor
Hartford, CT 06103-3708

collin.udell@jacksonlewis.com
860-522-0404
Party name: Lime Energy Services Company and Prestige Cruises International
Matthew T. NelsonWarner Norcross & Judd LLP
900 Fifth Third Center
111 Lyon Street, N.W.
Grand Rapids, MI 49503

mnelson@wnj.com
(616) 752-2539
Party name: DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar
Benjamin G. RobbinsNew England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111-2504

benrobbins@nelfonline.org
(617) 695-3660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation, et al.