No. 16-1275
Title:Virginia Uranium, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
John Warren, et al.
Docketed:April 25, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1005)
   Decision Date:February 17, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 25, 2017)
May 02 2017Consent the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners
May 17 2017Waiver of right of respondents John Warren, et al. to respond filed.
May 23 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 8, 2017.
May 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. (Distributed)
May 25 2017Brief amici curiae of Senators Tom Cotton, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jun 01 2017Response Requested. (Due July 3, 2017)
Jun 15 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 2, 2017.
Aug 02 2017Brief of respondents John Warren, et al. in opposition filed.
Aug 15 2017Reply of petitioners Virginia Uranium, Inc., et al. filed.
Aug 16 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Apr 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Apr 23 2018Supplemental brief of respondents John Warren, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018Petition GRANTED.
May 22 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Virginia Uranium, Inc., et al..
Blanket Consent
May 23 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, John Warren, et al..
Blanket Consent
May 24 2018Joint motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 11 2018Joint motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 19, 2018. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 27, 2018.
Jul 19 2018Brief of petitioner Virginia Uranium, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Nuclear Energy Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Former Nuclear Regulators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Entergy Operations, Inc. and Entergy Nuclear Operations, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Senator Tom Cotton, Senator Jim Inhofe, and Senator Ted Cruz filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 5, 2018
Aug 27 2018Brief of respondents John Warren, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 04 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Brief amici curiae of National Conference of State Legislators, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Brief amici curiae of The Roanoke River Basin Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Brief amici curiae of Preemption Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Brief amici curiae of Members of the Southern Virginia Delegation to the Virginia General Assembly, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Sep 12 2018CIRCULATED
Sep 18 2018The entire record from the U.S.D.C. Western Dist. of Virginia is electronic and located on PACER.
Sep 26 2018Reply of petitioners Virginia Uranium, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Virginia Uranium, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Toby Jay Heytens
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

theytens@oag.state.va.us
804-786-7240
Party name: John Warren, et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Sean Hoe Donahue
    Counsel of Record
Donahue, Goldberg, & Weaver, LLP
1111 14th Street, NW, Suite 510A
Washington, DC 20005

sean@donahuegoldberg.com
2022777085
Party name: THE ROANOKE RIVER BASIN ASSOCIATION, DAN RIVER BASIN ASSOCIATION AND PIEDMONT ENVIRONMENTAL COUNCIL
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
3172326255
Party name: States of Indiana, Washington, Hawaii, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Jersey, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, and Texas
Derek T. Ho
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

dho@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7931
Party name: Preemption Law Professors
Caleb Adam Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Environmental and Regulatory Law Clinic
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

cjaffe@law.virginia.edu
4349244776
Party name: Members of the Southern Virginia Delegation to the Virginia General Assembly, Local Chambers of Commerce, Civic, Trade, and Economic Development Associations, and Municipalities
John J. Korzen
    Counsel of Record
Wake Forest University School of Law
P.O. Box 7206
Winston-Salem, NC 27109

korzenjj@wfu.edu
3367585832
Party name: National Conference of State Legislators, National League of Cities, and International City/County Management Association
Peter C. Meier
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Hastings, Janofsky & Walker LLP
55 Second Street
24th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105-3441

petermeier@paulhastings.com
(415) 856-7000
Party name: Nuclear Energy Institute
Erin E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

erin.murphy@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Erin E. MurphyKirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

erin.murphy@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Jay E. Silberg
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
1200 Seventeenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

jay.silberg@pillsburylaw.com
202-663-8063
Party name: FORMER NUCLEAR REGULATORS
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: Entergy Operations, Inc. and Entergy Nuclear Operations, Inc.
Gordon D. ToddSidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

gtodd@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: Senators Tom Cotton, et al.
Gordon Dwyer Todd
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin,LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

gtodd@sidley.com
2027368760
Party name: Senator Tom Cotton, Senator Jim Inhofe, and Senator Ted Cruz