No. 16-1274
Title:Ting Xue, Petitioner
v.
Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Docketed:April 24, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-9540)
   Decision Date:November 25, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:January 23, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 24 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 24, 2017)
May 10 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
May 23 2017Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Justice Institute filed.
May 24 2017Brief amicus curiae of Alliance Defending Freedom filed.
May 24 2017Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, et al. filed.
May 24 2017Brief amici curiae of The Foundation for Moral Law, et al. filed.
May 24 2017Brief amicus curiae of Advocates International filed.
May 25 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 23, 2017.
Jun 15 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 24, 2017.
Jul 20 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 29, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Fred A. Rowley Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
355 South Grand Avenue
49th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

fred.rowley@mto.com
(213) 683-9100
Party name: Ting Xue
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Other
M. Miller BakerMcDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001-1531

mbaker@mwe.com
(202) 756-8000
Party name: Alliance Defending Freedom
John A. EidsmoeFoundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
(334) 262-1245
Party name: The Foundation for Moral Law, et al.
Steffen N. JohnsonWinston & Strawn LLP
1700 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@winston.com
(202) 282-5000
Party name: Christian Legal Society, et al.
Tim NewtonMurphy & Grantland, P.A.
4406-B Forest Drive, P.O. Box 6648
Columbia, SC 29206

tnewton@murphygrantland.com
(803)-782-4100
Party name: Advocates International
Kevin T. SniderPacific Justice Institute
P.O. Box 276600
Sacramento , CA 95827

ksnider@pji.org
(916) 857-6900
Party name: Pacific Justice Institute