No. 16-1251
Title:Dale W. Steager, West Virginia State Tax Commissioner, Petitioner
v.
CSX Transportation, Inc.
Docketed:April 19, 2017
Linked with 16A738
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Appeals of West Virginia
   Case Numbers:(15-0935)
   Decision Date:November 16, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 18 2017Application (16A738) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 14, 2017 to April 15, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jan 25 2017Application (16A738) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 17, 2017.
Apr 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 19, 2017)
May 05 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 19, 2017.
Jun 14 2017Brief of respondent CSX Transportation, Inc. in opposition filed.
Jun 28 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jul 27 2017Reply of petitioner Mark W. Matkovich, West Virginia State Tax Commissioner filed.(Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas M. Johnson Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Deputy Attorney General
Office of the Attorney General
State Capitol Building 1, Rm. 26-E
Charleston, WV 25305-0220

tjohnson@wvago.gov
(304) 558-2021
Party name: Mark W. Matkovich, West Virginia State Tax Commissioner
Thomas Michael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
State Capitol Building 1, Rm. E-26
Charleston, WV 25305

tjohnson@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: Steager, WV State Tax Comm'r
Attorneys for Respondent
James W. McBride
    Counsel of Record
Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC
901 K Street, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

jmcbride@bakerdonelson.com
(202) 508-3400
Party name: CSX Transportation, Inc.