No. 16-1231
Title:Anthony Douglas Elonis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 13, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(12-3798)
   Decision Date:October 28, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:January 11, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 11 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 15, 2017)
May 10 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 14, 2017.
Jun 14 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jun 26 2017Reply of petitioner Anthony Douglas Elonis filed. (Distributed)
Jun 28 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Abraham J. Rein
    Counsel of Record
Four Penn Center, 13th Floor
1600 John F. Kennedy Boulevard
Philadelphia, PA 19103

arein@postschell.com
(215) 587-1000
Party name: Anthony Douglas Elonis
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: United States