No. 16-1221
Title:Conagra Brands, Inc., fka ConAgra Foods, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Robert Briseno, et al.
Docketed:April 12, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-55727)
   Decision Date:January 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 14, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 12, 2017)
Apr 18 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 16, 2017.
Apr 27 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
May 01 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for respondents.
May 12 2017Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
May 12 2017Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
May 12 2017Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers filed.
May 12 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Grocery Manufacturers Association filed.
Jun 16 2017Brief of respondents Robert Briseno, et al. in opposition filed.
Jul 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jul 05 2017Reply of petitioner Conagra Brands, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Jul 11 2017Supplemental brief of respondents Robert Briseno, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jul 13 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner Conagra Brands, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Aug 18 2017Second supplemental brief of respondents Robert Briseno, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Aug 18 2017Second supplemental brief of petitioner Conagra Brands, Inc. filed. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
(202)-879-3939
Party name: Conagra Brands, Inc.
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Conagra Brands, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Samuel Issacharoff
    Counsel of Record
40 Washington Square South
Suite 411J
New York, NY 10012

si13@nyu.edu
(212) 998-6580
Party name: Robert Briseno, et al.
Samuel Issacharoff
    Counsel of Record
Civil Jury Project at New York University School of Law
40 Washington Square South
New York, NY 10012

si13@nyu.edu
212-998-6580
Party name: Robert Briseno, et al.
Other
Anton MetlitskyO'Melveny &Meyers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
(212) 326-2000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Andrew J. PincusMayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers
Richard A. SampWashington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

rsamp@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Charles Christian SiposPerkins Coie, LLP
1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101-3099

csipos@perkinscoie.com
(206)-359-8000
Party name: The Grocery Manufacturers Association