No. 16-1220
Title:Animal Science Products, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Hebei Welcome Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd., et al.
Docketed:April 12, 2017
Linked with 16A650
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-4791)
   Decision Date:September 20, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:November 4, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2017Application (16A650) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 2, 2017 to April 3, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Jan 03 2017Application (16A650) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until April 3, 2017.
Apr 03 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 12, 2017)
Apr 25 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 5, 2017.
Apr 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Professors Williams S. Dodge and Paul B. Stephan filed.
May 16 2017Letter of May 11, 2017, from counsel for petitioners received waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5.
Jun 05 2017Brief of respondents Hebei Welcome Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd., et al. in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 13 2017Reply of petitioners Animal Science Products, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jun 26 2017The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Nov 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 27 2017Supplemental brief of respondents Hebei Welcome Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2017Supplemental brief of petitioners Animal Science Products, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 12 2018Petition GRANTED limited to Question 2 presented by the petition.
Feb 15 2018Blanket Consent filed by respondents Hebei Welcome Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd., et al.
Blanket Consent
Feb 23 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 24, 2018.
Feb 26 2018Brief of petitioners Animal Science Products, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 26 2018Joint appendix filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 01 2018Brief amici curiae of Professors Of Conflict Of Laws And Civil Procedure As Amici Curiae In Support Of Petitioners filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Professors of International Litigation in Support of Neither Party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Mar 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of The United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Donald Clarke and Nicholas Calcina Howson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Antitrust Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Professors Samuel Estreicher and Thomas Lee filed in Support of Neither Party. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 07 2018CIRCULATED
Mar 19 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 22 2018Joint motion of respondents and amicus curiae Ministry of Commerce of the People's Republic of China for leave to allow Ministry of Commerce of the People's Republic of China to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main Document
Mar 28 2018Brief of respondents Hebei Welcome Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Apr 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of Ministry of Commerce of the People's Republic of China filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of China Chamber of International Commerce filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2018Brief amici curiae of Chinese Professors of Administrative Law filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 13 2018Joint motion of respondents and amicus curiae Ministry of Commerce of the People's Republic of China for leave to allow Ministry of Commerce of the People's Republic of China to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 17 2018Reply of petitioners Animal Science Products, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Julian Gottlieb
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
1401 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

mgottlieb@bsfllp.com
2022379617
Party name: Animal Science Products, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathan M. Jacobson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
1301 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor
New York, NY 10019

jjacobson@wsgr.com
212-497-7700
Party name: Hebei Welcome Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd., et al.
Other
Richard M. Brunell
    Counsel of Record
American Antitrust Institute
1025 Connecticut Ave.
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036

rbrunell@antitrustinstitute.org
202-600-9640
Party name: American Antitrust Institute
Timothy J. Droske
    Counsel of Record
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
50 South Sixth Street
Suite 1500
Minneapolis, MN 55402

droske.tim@dorsey.com
612-492-6758
Party name: Chinese Professors of Administrative Law YING Songnian, MA Huaide, JIANG Ming’an, YU An, YANG Jianshun, and LI Honglei
Samuel Estreicher
    Counsel of Record
NYU School of Law
40 Washington Sq. South
New York, NY 10012

samuel.estreicher@nyu.edu
212-998-6226
Party name: Professors Samuel Estreicher and Thomas Lee
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Jonathan S. Massey
    Counsel of Record
Massey & Gail, LLP
1325 G Street, N.W., Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

jmassey@masseygail.com
202-652-4511
Party name: Professors of International Litigation
Brian Philip Murray
    Counsel of Record
Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP
230 Park Avenue
Suite 530
New York, NY 10169

bmurray@glancylaw.com
2126825340
Party name: Donald Clarke and Nicholas Calcina Howson
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Ministry of Commerce of the People's Republic of China
Neil Anthony Friedman Popovic
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
Four Embarcadero Center
17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

npopovic@sheppardmullin.com
415.434.9100
Party name: Professors of Conflict of Laws and Civil Procedure
Luke A. Sobota
    Counsel of Record
Three Crowns LLP
3000 K Street NW
Suite 101
Washington, DC 20007

luke.sobota@threecrownsllp.com
202-540-9477
Party name: U.S. Chamber of Commerce
Sienho Yee
    Counsel of Record
Law Building
Wuhan University
Wuhan, Hubei, China 430072, XX 430072

yee@sienhoyee.org
+86 27 68752707
Party name: China Chamber of International Commerce
Jonathan S. MasseyMassey & Gail, LLP
1325 G Street, NW, Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

jmassey@masseygail.com
(202) 652-4511
Party name: Professors Williams S. Dodge and Paul B. Stephan